NY S00710 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes protocols for assisted outpatient treatment for substance abuse; provides criteria for assisted outpatient treatment for substance abuse; provides for service, right to counsel, hearings, appeals and applications for additional periods of treatment; makes related changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes protocols for assisted outpatient treatment for substance abuse; provides criteria for assisted outpatient treatment for substance abuse; provides for service, right to counsel, hearings, appeals and applications for additional periods of treatment; makes related changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse
2017-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1705
2017-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-04SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

Same As/Similar To

A00524 (Same As) 2017-01-09 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback