NY S00700 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to allowing attorneys having offices in the state to reside in an adjoining state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals provisions relating to allowing attorneys having offices in the state to reside in an adjoining state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-07Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2022-02-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-02-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-01-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2022-01-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2022-01-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.101
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2022-01-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-01-05Assemblydied in assembly
2021-05-12Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2021-05-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-05-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-05-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-04-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-04-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.837
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05895 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback