NY S00700 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to full day kindergarten.
Title
Relates to full day kindergarten.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | MOTION TO OVERRIDE VETO BY GOVERNOR |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | TAKEN FROM TABLE |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | TABLED |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.263 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.122 |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | substituted for a1625b |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.632 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 700B |
2018-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 700A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01625 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - substituted by s700b