NY S00695 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires cell towers to be equipped with a back-up power source in case of a power outage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires cell towers to be equipped with a back-up power source in case of a power outage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-03SenateAMENDED 695B
2021-02-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.247
2021-01-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 695A
2021-01-27SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback