NY S00691 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for including uncles, aunts, nephews, and nieces in the definition of "family member" in relation to regulations pertaining to rights of family members to succeed in certain cases to the rights of certain tenants.
Title
Provides for including uncles, aunts, nephews, and nieces in the definition of "family member" in relation to regulations pertaining to rights of family members to succeed in certain cases to the rights of certain tenants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.690 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05448 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - enacting clause stricken