NY S00687 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of imitation weapon.
Title
Clarifies the definition of imitation weapon.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-16 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.15 |
2022-08-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.501 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.591 |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | substituted for a3998 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.130 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.104 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03998 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - substituted by s687