NY S00679 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of addiction services and supports.
Title
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of addiction services and supports.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.123 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.762 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.798 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a1927a |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-02-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-25 | Senate | AMENDED 679A |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.90 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A01927 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s679a