NY S00670 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.
Title
Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Mike Martucci [R] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1199 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07334 (Same As) 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken
A08289 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to banks
A08289 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to banks