NY S00670 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 670A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurers to provide coverage for long term medical care for Lyme disease and other tick borne related pathogens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health insurers to provide coverage for long term medical care for Lyme disease and other tick borne related pathogens.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 670A
2018-05-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2017-01-04SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10621 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - referred to insurance

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback