NY S00659 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - SIGNED CHAP.25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - SIGNED CHAP.25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.
Title
Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.25 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.8 |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | substituted for a585a |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.34 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 659A |
2019-01-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00585 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - SIGNED CHAP.25