NY S00644 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.127
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Validates certain acts of the Islip Union Free school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects including project numbers 0003-12, 0011-007, 0011-008, 0003-013, 0007-009, 0007-010, 0007-012 and 0011-009.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validates certain acts of the Islip Union Free school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects including project numbers 0003-12, 0011-007, 0011-008, 0003-013, 0007-009, 0007-010, 0007-012 and 0011-009.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08AssemblyVETOED MEMO.127
2019-10-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.565
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8293
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1503
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 644A
2019-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A08293 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s644a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback