NY S00643 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits an insurer to rescind or retroactively cancel a policy in circumstance involving an accident staged to defraud an insurer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits an insurer to rescind or retroactively cancel a policy in circumstance involving an accident staged to defraud an insurer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20Assemblyreferred to insurance
2019-05-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.661
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A06210 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - referred to insurance

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback