NY S00642 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for the issuance of broad form coverage.
Title
Extends authorization for the issuance of broad form coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.70 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.43 |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | substituted for a3676 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.21 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03676 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.70