NY S00621 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts Carlos' law; relates to crimes involving the death or injury of a worker; establishes higher fines for corporations who commit such crimes; establishes the crimes of endangering the welfare of a worker in the third, second and first degrees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts Carlos' law; relates to crimes involving the death or injury of a worker; establishes higher fines for corporations who commit such crimes; establishes the crimes of endangering the welfare of a worker in the third, second and first degrees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-05-03Senate1ST REPORT CAL.860
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A04947 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback