NY S00615 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - SIGNED CHAP.105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to contribution and receipt limitations applicable to candidates for election to any public office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to contribution and receipt limitations applicable to candidates for election to any public office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateSIGNED CHAP.105
2023-03-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-03-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-03-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-03-09Assemblyordered to third reading cal.30
2023-03-09Assemblysubstituted for a2556
2023-01-30Assemblyreferred to election law
2023-01-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-01-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-01-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1
2023-01-05SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02556 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - substituted by s615

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback