NY S00614 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits election commissioners and deputy election commissioners from holding a publicly elected office or from being the respective chair of the county democratic or republican committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits election commissioners and deputy election commissioners from holding a publicly elected office or from being the respective chair of the county democratic or republican committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.624
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-01-10Assemblyreferred to election law
2023-01-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-09SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.13
2023-01-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-01-05SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A03331 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback