NY S00613 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.276
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.276
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person designated as a candidate for two or more party nominations for an office to be filled at the time of a general election who is not nominated at a primary election by one or more such parties may decline the nomination of one or more parties not later than ten days after the primary election.
Title
Provides that a person designated as a candidate for two or more party nominations for an office to be filled at the time of a general election who is not nominated at a primary election by one or more such parties may decline the nomination of one or more parties not later than ten days after the primary election.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.276 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.705 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a4142a |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 613A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1050 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04142 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s613a