NY S00590 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain property in the borough of Manhattan from the prohibition of alcohol sales for on-premises consumption within a certain distance from a church.
Title
Exempts certain property in the borough of Manhattan from the prohibition of alcohol sales for on-premises consumption within a certain distance from a church.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.122 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |