NY S00588 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the interviewing of children in the presence of the subject of the report.
Title
Relates to the interviewing of children in the presence of the subject of the report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.133 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06800 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to children and families