NY S00586 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the sale, lease, transfer or use of existing outdoor school playgrounds for the construction or renovation of a school building which would eliminate use of such playground space for outdoor recreation unless an alternative plan for outdoor recreation is provided.
Title
Restricts the sale, lease, transfer or use of existing outdoor school playgrounds for the construction or renovation of a school building which would eliminate use of such playground space for outdoor recreation unless an alternative plan for outdoor recreation is provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 586B |
2012-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 586A |
2011-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04832 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE