NY S00553 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the most recent rating of every nursing home assigned pursuant to the U.S. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (CMS rating), shall be prominently displayed on the home page of the department's website and at each nursing home facility.
Title
Requires that the most recent rating of every nursing home assigned pursuant to the U.S. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (CMS rating), shall be prominently displayed on the home page of the department's website and at each nursing home facility.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2037 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.347 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.347 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02037 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - signed chap.441