NY S00552 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a procedure for the governor's annual message to the legislature regarding the state of the state.
Title
Relates to establishing a procedure for the governor's annual message to the legislature regarding the state of the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00282 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary