NY S00547 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualifications for holding the offices of assistant district attorney and assistant public defender in the county of Chenango; allows assistant district attorneys and assistant public defenders in Chenango county to reside in Chenango county or an adjoining county.
Title
Relates to the qualifications for holding the offices of assistant district attorney and assistant public defender in the county of Chenango; allows assistant district attorneys and assistant public defenders in Chenango county to reside in Chenango county or an adjoining county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.292 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.322 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a1244 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.268 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01244 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.292