NY S00524 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing speed limits in cities with populations in excess of one million people by easing restrictions so cities can establish speed limits below twenty five miles per hour.
Title
Relates to establishing speed limits in cities with populations in excess of one million people by easing restrictions so cities can establish speed limits below twenty five miles per hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.411 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1741 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 524A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04655 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation