NY S00518 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the number and location of early voting poll sites in certain counties.
Title
Relates to the number and location of early voting poll sites in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.870 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 518A |
2021-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07162 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to election law