NY S00498 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Simplifies the excess line insurance placement affidavit requirements.
Title
Simplifies the excess line insurance placement affidavit requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 498A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.220 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05241 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to insurance