NY S00479 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 479A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the task force on social innovation, entrepreneurship and enterprise to study and report on developing and sustaining socially innovative programs and businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the task force on social innovation, entrepreneurship and enterprise to study and report on developing and sustaining socially innovative programs and businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 479A
2019-03-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A02048 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - print number 2048a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback