NY S00470 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that freestanding diagnostic and treatment centers receiving comprehensive family planning reproductive health services grants, shall be eligible for state aid for indigent care.
Title
Provides that freestanding diagnostic and treatment centers receiving comprehensive family planning reproductive health services grants, shall be eligible for state aid for indigent care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.31 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01080 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health