NY S00452 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of intoxication of the victim as a defense in sex crimes; creates an affirmative defense where the defendant, at the time he or she engaged in the conduct constituting the offense, did not know of the facts or conditions responsible for such lack of consent.
Title
Prohibits the use of intoxication of the victim as a defense in sex crimes; creates an affirmative defense where the defendant, at the time he or she engaged in the conduct constituting the offense, did not know of the facts or conditions responsible for such lack of consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.363 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 452A |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.100 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05519 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - reported referred to rules