NY S00446 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the emergency or involuntary admission of persons with mental illness when there is a risk of serious physical harm or serious psychiatric harm.
Title
Provides for the emergency or involuntary admission of persons with mental illness when there is a risk of serious physical harm or serious psychiatric harm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2018-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1359 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1681 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |