NY S00434 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 434A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes municipalities in the county of Orange to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to such municipalities' annual tax levy in accordance with applicable law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes municipalities in the county of Orange to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to such municipalities' annual tax levy in accordance with applicable law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 434A
2024-05-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-01-25Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2023-01-25SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-01-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-01-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.136
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01130 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback