NY S00427 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from transporting, holding, buying, selling, giving, receiving or marketing a nonambulatory animal unless such animal is first humanely euthanized without undue delay from the time that such animal becomes nonambulatory; makes certain exceptions; provides violation provisions; and defines relevant terms.
Title
Prohibits any person from transporting, holding, buying, selling, giving, receiving or marketing a nonambulatory animal unless such animal is first humanely euthanized without undue delay from the time that such animal becomes nonambulatory; makes certain exceptions; provides violation provisions; and defines relevant terms.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Eric Adams [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Thomas Duane [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A04615 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to agriculture