NY S00415 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.460
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.460
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the adjudication of certain traffic infractions and notices of liability involving the use of photo monitoring devices; authorizes adjudication of traffic control signal indications in the village of Pelham Manor.
Title
Relates to the adjudication of certain traffic infractions and notices of liability involving the use of photo monitoring devices; authorizes adjudication of traffic control signal indications in the village of Pelham Manor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.460 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.790 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a1145a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 415A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1520 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01145 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s415a