NY S00415 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Queens Midtown tunnel as the "New York State First Responders Tunnel".
Title
Designates the Queens Midtown tunnel as the "New York State First Responders Tunnel".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | AMENDED 415A |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.138 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.29 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06241 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - print number 6241a