NY S00410 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for giving of just compensation upon the taking of any billboard in accordance with the eminent domain procedure law; removes amortization schedules for the removal of billboards in areas other than industrial and manufacturing zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for giving of just compensation upon the taking of any billboard in accordance with the eminent domain procedure law; removes amortization schedules for the removal of billboards in areas other than industrial and manufacturing zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-19Assemblyreferred to local governments
2014-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1595
2014-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-05-22Assemblyreferred to local governments
2013-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-05-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.711
2013-05-21SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2013-01-09SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00091 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to local governments

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback