NY S00410 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for a uniform allowable resource exemption and disregard for an applicant or recipient with an automobile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a uniform allowable resource exemption and disregard for an applicant or recipient with an automobile.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-02-21SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
2011-01-05SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

A02956 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - enacting clause stricken
A07236 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback