NY S00409 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A658A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A658A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the problem gambling advisory council.
Title
Establishes the problem gambling advisory council.
Sponsors
Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A658A |
2022-04-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 409A |
2022-01-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.437 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A00658 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled