NY S00402 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a revolving loan fund through the New York state energy research and development authority for the purpose of building renewable energy storage systems scaled to function as microgrids to power housing owned by the New York city housing authority.
Title
Creates a revolving loan fund through the New York state energy research and development authority for the purpose of building renewable energy storage systems scaled to function as microgrids to power housing owned by the New York city housing authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 402A |
2024-02-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01235 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - print number 1235a