NY S00399 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - SIGNED CHAP.621
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - SIGNED CHAP.621
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows pregnant inmates to have one support person in the delivery room; requires information on the nursery program, pregnancy counseling and abortion services.
Title
Allows pregnant inmates to have one support person in the delivery room; requires information on the nursery program, pregnancy counseling and abortion services.
Sponsors
Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.621 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.698 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a616a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 399A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.930 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A00616 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s399a