NY S00371 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Niagara parks reinvestment act"; requires fifty percent of parking revenue generated at state parks in the county of Niagara to be deposited in the Niagara parks reinvestment fund; establishes the Niagara parks reinvestment fund.
Title
Enacts the "Niagara parks reinvestment act"; requires fifty percent of parking revenue generated at state parks in the county of Niagara to be deposited in the Niagara parks reinvestment fund; establishes the Niagara parks reinvestment fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05596 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development