NY S00367 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - 2ND REPORT CAL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the teen driver safety commission consisting of 12 members; requires the commission to study, examine and review the issue of teen driver safety; requires the commission to report its findings, conclusions and recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the teen driver safety commission consisting of 12 members; requires the commission to study, examine and review the issue of teen driver safety; requires the commission to report its findings, conclusions and recommendations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.420
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A06929 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback