NY S00364 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to saliva swabs and chemical tests in certain cases.
Title
Relates to saliva swabs and chemical tests in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1206 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.213 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02530 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation