NY S00355 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring propeller guards on vessels used to instruct children under the age of eighteen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring propeller guards on vessels used to instruct children under the age of eighteen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1470
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A03766 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - enacting clause stricken
A06719 (Same As) 2019-03-15 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback