NY S00348 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the reproductive freedom and equity grant program to ensure access to abortion care in the state by providing funding to abortion providers and non-profit organizations whose primary function is to facilitate access to abortion care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the reproductive freedom and equity grant program to ensure access to abortion care in the state by providing funding to abortion providers and non-profit organizations whose primary function is to facilitate access to abortion care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-22Assemblyreferred to health
2024-01-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.83
2024-01-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 348C
2024-01-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-01-24Assemblyreferred to health
2023-01-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-23SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.151
2023-01-17SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-01-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 348B
2023-01-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2023-01-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 348A
2023-01-06SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A00361 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S348
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00348&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00348
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00348&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00348A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00348&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00348B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00348&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00348C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S348#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S348#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S348#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback