NY S00328 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes certain restrictions on eligibility for personal and home care services under medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes certain restrictions on eligibility for personal and home care services under medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-01-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.162
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2023-05-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A06346 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback