NY S00319 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires anti-bias training for every medical student, medical resident and physician assistant student in the state; requires the department of health to make an annual report on the implementation and effectiveness of such training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires anti-bias training for every medical student, medical resident and physician assistant student in the state; requires the department of health to make an annual report on the implementation and effectiveness of such training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-26Assemblyreferred to health
2024-02-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-02-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.161
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-17Assemblyreferred to health
2023-05-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.847
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A05625 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback