NY S00316 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing voting by incarcerated people.
Title
Relates to authorizing voting by incarcerated people.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-06 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00412 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - opinion referred to judiciary