NY S00312 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - PRINT NUMBER 312B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - PRINT NUMBER 312B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of aggravated harassment of a police officer where a person causes or attempts to cause such police officer to come into contact with bottles, rocks, flammable liquids, hazardous or dangerous substances or objects, blood, seminal fluid, urine, feces, saliva or the contents of a toilet bowl, by throwing, tossing, intentionally expectorating or expelling such fluid or material.
Title
Establishes the crime of aggravated harassment of a police officer where a person causes or attempts to cause such police officer to come into contact with bottles, rocks, flammable liquids, hazardous or dangerous substances or objects, blood, seminal fluid, urine, feces, saliva or the contents of a toilet bowl, by throwing, tossing, intentionally expectorating or expelling such fluid or material.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 312B |
2020-07-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 312A |
2020-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00953 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes