NY S00308 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 308A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 308A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state authorities to conduct open meetings and provide an internet broadcast of its meetings.
Title
Requires state authorities to conduct open meetings and provide an internet broadcast of its meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 308A |
2016-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 308B |
2016-04-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 308A |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |