NY S00307 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the division of veterans' affairs to establish and operate an electronic database of the number of openings in each of the 4 state veterans' homes and the number of persons on the waiting list for each such veterans' home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the division of veterans' affairs to establish and operate an electronic database of the number of openings in each of the 4 state veterans' homes and the number of persons on the waiting list for each such veterans' home.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1357
2018-01-29SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1520
2017-06-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 307A
2017-01-23SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2017-01-04SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A00630 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to veterans' affairs

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00307&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00307&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00307
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00307&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00307A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S307#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S307#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S307#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S307#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S307#SC4
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S307#SC5
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S307#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback